I wonder how many of these once thriving US Cities have had Multi-Decade Democrat “Minority” Mayors, Majority “Minority” City Councils AND “Minority” Police Chiefs?
Let’s look at Oakland as an example.
Current CA governor, Jerry Brown was Mayor from 1999 to 2007.
His successor, Ronald Vernie “Ron” Dellums became Mayor 2007 to 2011. Dellums was the first African American elected to Congress from Northern California and the first openly Socialist Congressman since World War II.
Jean Quan is the current Mayor. A DEMOCRAT sympathetic to the Occupy Movement.
Need we say more?
RE: I wonder how many of these once thriving US Cities have had Multi-Decade Democrat Minority Mayors, Majority Minority City Councils AND Minority Police Chiefs?
_____________________
Here’s another big city — CLEVELAND
Past 5 Mayors :
Dennis J. Kucinich 19771979 Democrat
George V. Voinovich 19801989 Republican
Michael R. White 19902001 Democrat
Jane L. Campbell January 7, 2002 January 2, 2006 Democrat
Frank G. Jackson January 2, 2006Present Democrat
Need we say more?
RE: I wonder how many of these once thriving US Cities have had Multi-Decade Democrat Minority Mayors, Majority Minority City Councils AND Minority Police Chiefs?
_____________________
Let’s look at the Mayors of Baltimore:
Thomas L. J. D’Alesandro III 1967 1971 Democrat
William Donald Schaefer 1971 1987 Democrat
Clarence H. Burns January 26, 1987 December, 1987 Democrat
Kurt L. Schmoke December, 1987 December 7, 1999 Democrat
Martin J. O’Malley December 7, 1999 January 17, 2007 Democrat
Sheila Dixon January 17, 2007 February 4, 2010 Democrat
Stephanie Rawlings-Blake February 4, 2010 Democrat
The last Republican Mayor elected in Baltimore was in 1963.
RE: I wonder how many of these once thriving US Cities have had Multi-Decade Democrat Minority Mayors, Majority Minority City Councils AND Minority Police Chiefs?
_______________________
Now let’s have a look at the Mayors of the once great City of St. Louis:
37 Joseph Darst April 19, 1949 April 21, 1953 Democratic 1
38 Raymond Tucker April 21, 1953 April 20, 1965 Democratic 3
39 Alfonso Cervantes April 20, 1965 April 17, 1973 Democratic 2
40 John Poelker April 17, 1973 April 19, 1977 Democratic 1
41 James F. Conway April 19, 1977 April 21, 1981 Democratic 1
42 Vincent C. Schoemehl April 21, 1981 April 20, 1993 Democratic 3
43 Freeman Bosley, Jr. April 20, 1993 April 15, 1997 Democratic 1
44 Clarence Harmon April 15, 1997 April 17, 2001 Democratic 1
45 Francis G. Slay April 17, 2001 Incumbent Democratic 3
The past three generations have NOT SEEN a Republican Mayor in St. Louis at all.