Ralph M. Hall, representing the Fourth Congressional District in Texas, was first elected to the U.S. House of Representatives in 1980 and has been re-elected to each succeeding Congress. In January, 2004, Congressman Hall filed for re-election as a Republican and resigned from the Democratic Caucus. He was reappointed as a Republican Member of the Energy and Commerce Committee and the Science Committee and was permitted to retain his seniority. He ranks second in seniority behind Energy and Commerce Chairman Billy Tauzin and also ranks second behind Science Committee Chairman Sherwood Boehlert.
He served as the Ranking Democrat on the Science Committee from August 5, 1999 through January 5, 2004, when his party switch became official. He also served as a senior member of the Energy and Commerce Committee and a member of its Energy and Air Quality Subcommittee and Health Subcommittee for many years. He was previously the Ranking Democrat on the Energy and Power Subcommittee and served four years as Chairman of the Space Subcommittee. TEXAS PUBLIC SERVICE Between 1950 and 1962, Ralph Hall served as County Judge of Rockwall County, Texas. In 1958-1959, he served as President of the State Judges and Commissioners Association. Hall served in the Texas Senate from 1962 to 1972, where he served as President Pro Tempore of the Senate in 1968-1969. PERSONAL BACKGROUND Ralph M. Hall was born in Fate (Rockwall County), Texas, on May 3, 1923, attended the public schools in Rockwall and graduated from Rockwall High School. He joined the U.S. Navy on December 10, 1942, serving as a lieutenant (senior grade) aircraft carrier pilot from 1942 to 1945. Hall attended Texas Christian University, Fort Worth, in 1943; attended the University of Texas, Austin, 1946-1947, and received his LL.B. from Southern Methodist University, Dallas, in 1951. He was admitted to the Texas Bar in 1951 and maintained a private law practice in Rockwall for many years. He is the former President and Chief Executive Officer, Texas Aluminum Corporation; past General Counsel, Texas Extrusion Company, Inc.; past organizer, Chairman, Board of Directors, now Chairman of the Board, Lakeside National Bank of Rockwall (now Lakeside Bancshares, Inc.); past Chairman, Board of Directors, Lakeside News, Inc.; now Chairman, Board of Directors, Bank of Crowley; and President, North and East Trading Company.
|
|
|
Images from top to bottom: Rep. Hall at a reception for the WWII memorial, Rep. Hall in uniform with his wife, Mary Ellen in 1945 and Rep. Hall with his wife, Mary Ellen and former U.S. President Ronald Reagan. |
|
|